Pruchnicki v. Envision Healthcare Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Peggy Pruchnicki
Defendant: Envision Healthcare Corporation, Sheridan Healthcorp, Inc. and EmCare, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01193
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #25 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Peggy Pruchnicki. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Clark, Miles)
August 26, 2019 Filing 25 VIEW Corrected Image #26 as to SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Peggy Pruchnicki. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 11/24/2019.(Clark, Miles) Modified on 8/27/2019 (RFJ).
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #22 Stipulation to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/26/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 23, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #18 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Peggy Pruchnicki. Replies due by 8/30/2019. (Clark, Miles)
August 21, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION to File Second Amended Complaint; filed by Plaintiff Peggy Pruchnicki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Clark, Miles)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #20 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #18 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/23/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #18 Motion to Dismiss; filed by Plaintiff Peggy Pruchnicki. (Clark, Miles)
August 8, 2019 Filing 19 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Envision Healthcare Corporation. (Solis, Sean)
July 29, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants EmCare, Inc., Envision Healthcare Corporation, Sheridan Healthcorp, Inc.. Responses due by 8/12/2019. (Collignon, Casie)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew D Pearson for Defendants and approving Designation of Local Counsel Amanda C Yen. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/29/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants EmCare, Inc., Envision Healthcare Corporation, Sheridan Healthcorp, Inc.. (Perach, Amanda)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Matthew D. Pearson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Amanda C. Yen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5633791) by Defendants EmCare, Inc., Envision Healthcare Corporation, Sheridan Healthcorp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Yen, Amanda)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Amanda C. Yen. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/22/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Amanda C. Yen. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/22/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #7 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendants EmCare, Inc., Envision Healthcare Corporation, Sheridan Healthcorp, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Perach, Amanda)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #8 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendants EmCare, Inc., Envision Healthcare Corporation, Sheridan Healthcorp, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Perach, Amanda)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Mailing re: #4 Minute Order Removal Case, filed by Defendants EmCare, Inc., Envision Healthcare Corporation, Sheridan Healthcorp, Inc.. (Perach, Amanda)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/16/2019 re: #7 and #8 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petitions.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on the #7 and #8 Verified Petitions is DEFERRED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners Sean B. Solis and Casie D. Collignon shall provide their Colorado Bar numbers and a current Certificate of Good Standing from EACH state in which Petitioners have been admitted to practice law, in accordance with the instruction set forth on Page 2, No. 3, of the Verified Petitions. Petitioners shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file corrected Verified Petitions using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petitions, and Petitioners will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 VIEW Corrected Image #11 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Casie D. Collignon and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Amanda C. Yen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5623572) by Defendants EmCare, Inc., Envision Healthcare Corporation, Sheridan Healthcorp, Inc.. (Yen, Amanda) Modified on 7/19/2019 (RFJ).
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 VIEW Corrected Image #12 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Sean B. Solis and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Amanda C. Yen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5623551) by Defendants EmCare, Inc., Envision Healthcare Corporation, Sheridan Healthcorp, Inc.. (Yen, Amanda) Modified on 7/19/2019 (RFJ).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation for Extension of Time re: 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL - Complaint. Answers due 7/29/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC).
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re: #1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL - Complaint; filed by Defendants EmCare, Inc., Envision Healthcare Corporation, Sheridan Healthcorp, Inc.. (Perach, Amanda) Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) by attorney Amanda M. Perach. Court corrected entry on 7/11/2019 (RFJ).
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/9/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/24/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Casie D. Collignon, Sammantha J. Tillotson, and Sean B. Solis to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/23/2019. (no image attached) (MR)
July 9, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by EmCare, Inc., Envision Healthcare Corporation, Sheridan Healthcorp, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Enterprise Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Enterprise Parent Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent KKR Americas Fund XII, L.P., Corporate Parent KKR & Co. Inc. for EmCare, Inc., Envision Healthcare Corporation, Sheridan Healthcorp, Inc. added. (Perach, Amanda)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-795141-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5616899) by EmCare, Inc., Sheridan Healthcorp, Inc., Envision Healthcare Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perach, Amanda) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pruchnicki v. Envision Healthcare Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envision Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Sean B. Solis
Represented By: Amanda M. Perach
Represented By: Sammantha Tillotson
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Represented By: Matthew Pearson
Represented By: Casie D Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheridan Healthcorp, Inc.
Represented By: Sean B. Solis
Represented By: Amanda M. Perach
Represented By: Sammantha Tillotson
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Represented By: Matthew Pearson
Represented By: Casie D Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EmCare, Inc.
Represented By: Sean B. Solis
Represented By: Amanda M. Perach
Represented By: Sammantha Tillotson
Represented By: Amanda C Yen
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Represented By: Matthew Pearson
Represented By: Casie D Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Pruchnicki
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?