Church v. Turley et al
Plaintiff: Brian Church
Defendant: Lucas Turley, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and David Mason
Case Number: 2:2019cv01198
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
2 Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Defendants answer due 9/18/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 SECOND STIPULATION for Extension of Time re: #1 COMPLAINT; filed by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, David Mason, Lucas Turley. (Freeman, Robert)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Brian Church. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bryson, E.)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Defendants answer due 9/4/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01198-RFB-DJA. (no image attached) (ADR)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, David Mason, Lucas Turley. (Freeman, Robert) Modified text on 8/7/2019 (MMM).
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Church re #5 Summons Issued, #4 Proposed Summons to be issued. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Bryson, E.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Church re #5 Summons Issued, #3 Proposed Summons to be issued. David Mason served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Bryson, E.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Church re #2 Proposed Summons to be issued. Lucas Turley served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Bryson, E.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department by Plaintiff Brian Church. (Bryson, E.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Sgt David Mason by Plaintiff Brian Church. (Bryson, E.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Officer Lucas Turley by Plaintiff Brian Church. (Bryson, E.)
July 10, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (JM)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 First COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5617494) by Brian Church. Proof of service due by 10/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bryson, E.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Church v. Turley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Turley
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Mason
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Church
Represented By: E. Brent Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?