Chatmon v. Saul

Plaintiff: Raymond A Chatmon
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv01201
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01201-KJD-EJY. (no image attached) (JM)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 Certified Mail Returned re 8 Certified Mail. (JQC)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 Certified Mail Returned re #8 Certified Mail. (JQC)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Jaime Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #7 Summons Issued. Andrew Saul served on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/14/2019. (JQC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Certified Mail (#7018 1130 0001 5956 7305 & # 7018 1130 0001 5956 7305) re: #5 Order, #6 Complaint, & #7 Summons as to Andrew Saul. (JQC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul re #6 Complaint. (JQC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Raymond A Chatmon. Proof of service due by 10/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JQC)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is Granted. Plaintiff shall not be required to pre-pay the full filing fee of four hundred dollars ($400.00). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have sixty (60) days from the date of service to file their answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that henceforth, Plaintiff shall serve upon Defendant, or their attorney if they have retained one, a copy of every pleading, motion, or other document submitted for consideration by the court. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Raymond A Chatmon. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Safa, Cyrus)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #1 -1 Complaint. The complaint reflects an incorrectly named party. Counsel is advised to correct the discrepancy and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #1 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
July 11, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (DKJ)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Raymond A Chatmon. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Safa, Cyrus)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 VIEW #4 corrected image re complaint MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Raymond A Chatmon. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Safa, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chatmon v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond A Chatmon
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?