James v. City of Henderson
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Alan James
Defendant: City of Henderson
Case Number: 2:2019cv01207
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation; Re: #5 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/18/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) for Plaintiff to Respond re #5 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant City of Henderson. (Kemble, Brandon)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #5 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #5 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Jeffrey Alan James. (Hill, Melanie)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #5 . Attorney Nicholas G. Vaskov is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant City of Henderson. Responses due by 8/1/2019. (Kemble, Brandon)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant City of Henderson. (Kemble, Brandon)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by City of Henderson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kemble, Brandon)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/11/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/26/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 11, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JM)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-789531-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5619952) by City of Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kemble, Brandon) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. City of Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Alan James
Represented By: Melanie A. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Henderson
Represented By: Brandon P Kemble
Represented By: Nicholas G. Vaskov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?