Caione et al v. Coyne, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Gianluca Caione and Ioana Caione
Defendant: Ingram Micro Services, Inc., Michael J. Coyne, Jr., Ingram Micro Inc. and Rutledge Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01211
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by Michael J. Coyne, Jr., Ingram Micro Inc., Ingram Micro Services, Inc., Rutledge Company Inc. (Foley, Betty)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint proposed discovery plan, no later than 9/6/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Lien by Gianluca Caione, Ioana Caione. (Kane, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorneys' Lien by Gianluca Caione. (Kane, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #7 Answer to Complaint, by Defendants Michael J. Coyne, Jr., Ingram Micro Inc., Ingram Micro Services, Inc., Rutledge Company Inc. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Bohlke, Brooke)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #7 . Document is not in compliance with LR IA 10-2 as the case number is deficient. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #7 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 VIEW Corrected Image #9 as to ANSWER to Complaint; filed by Michael J. Coyne, Jr., Ingram Micro Inc., Ingram Micro Services, Inc., Rutledge Company Inc. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/26/2019.(Bohlke, Brooke) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Attorney's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorney Richard A Englemann and Herbert L. Michel, Jr. are advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (DKJ)
July 12, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Michael J. Coyne, Jr., Ingram Micro Inc., Ingram Micro Services, Inc., Rutledge Company Inc. (Bohlke, Brooke)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brooke A. Bohlke on behalf of Defendants Michael J. Coyne, Jr., Ingram Micro Inc., Ingram Micro Services, Inc., Rutledge Company Inc. Defendants' Notice of Appearance of Attorneys Joel D. Odou and Betty J. Foley (Bohlke, Brooke)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michael J. Coyne, Jr., Ingram Micro Inc., Ingram Micro Services, Inc., Rutledge Company Inc that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Bohlke, Brooke)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/11/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/26/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 11, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-18-780801-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5620404) by Rutledge Company, Inc. dba The Phoenix Group, Ingram Micro Services, Inc., Michael J. Coyne, Jr., Ingram Micro Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bohlke, Brooke) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caione et al v. Coyne, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingram Micro Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joel D. Odou
Represented By: Betty J Foley
Represented By: Brooke A. Bohlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Coyne, Jr.
Represented By: Joel D. Odou
Represented By: Betty J Foley
Represented By: Brooke A. Bohlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingram Micro Inc.
Represented By: Joel D. Odou
Represented By: Betty J Foley
Represented By: Brooke A. Bohlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rutledge Company Inc
Represented By: Joel D. Odou
Represented By: Betty J Foley
Represented By: Brooke A. Bohlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gianluca Caione
Represented By: Richard A Englemann
Represented By: Herbert L. Michel, Jr.
Represented By: Bradley J. Myers
Represented By: Michael C. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ioana Caione
Represented By: Richard A Englemann
Represented By: Herbert L. Michel, Jr.
Represented By: Bradley J. Myers
Represented By: Michael C. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?