The Learning Center, Inc. v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: The Learning Center, Inc.
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01213
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
2 Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to #9 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff The Learning Center, Inc.. (Chase, Garrett)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Replies due by 9/2/2019. (Downs, Andrew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Downs, Andrew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Setting Hearing on #7 MOTION to Dismiss and #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court: Motions Hearing set for 9/16/2019 at 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (no image attached) (DC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff The Learning Center, Inc.. Replies due by 8/20/2019.(Chase, Garrett)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff The Learning Center, Inc.. Responses due by 8/26/2019. (Chase, Garrett)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01213-JAD-DJA. (no image attached) (ADR)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/13/2019. (Downs, Andrew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT STATUS REPORT re: Removal; filed by Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Downs, Andrew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Lachman, Scott)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Downs, Andrew)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/11/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/26/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 11, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (JM)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Casualty Insurance Company added. (Downs, Andrew)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-795560-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5620477) by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 8/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (State Court Docket Sheet), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Downs, Andrew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Learning Center, Inc. v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Learning Center, Inc.
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Andrew B. Downs
Represented By: Scott Robert Lachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?