Bounonato v. Sam's West, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Bounonato
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01221
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT RE REMOVAL; filed by Defendant Sam's West, Inc.. (Kuhls, Timothy)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Sam's West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kuhls, Timothy)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by John Bounonato. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ross, Karen)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sam's West, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kuhls, Timothy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/12/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/27/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-19-792828-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5621841) by Sam's West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Answer, #5 Exhibit Request for Exemption)(Kuhls, Timothy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bounonato v. Sam's West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bounonato
Represented By: Karen H. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc.
Represented By: Robert K. Phillips
Represented By: Timothy David Kuhls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?