Glaster v. Golden Days Adult Daycare Center
Plaintiff: Abman Glaster
Defendant: Golden Days Adult Daycare Center
Case Number: 2:2019cv01223
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 8/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #3 the Amended Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #1 this case is DISMISSED and Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot. The Court Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this case be DISMISSED and Plaintiff's #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be DENIED as moot. Objections to R&R due by 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JM)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Abman Glaster. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JM)
July 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glaster v. Golden Days Adult Daycare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Days Adult Daycare Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abman Glaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?