Johnson v. Slaughter et al
Plaintiff: Vaughn Nathaniel Johnson
Defendant: Charles R. Slaughter, II and Celedon Trucking Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01245
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Discovery Hearing held on 9/11/2019 before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Nadia Von Magdenko, Esq.; Def Counsel: Ty Hanseen, Esq.; Time of Hearing: 2:00pm; Electronic Court Recorder Operator: Liberty/CRD; Recording start and end times: 1:57:40 - 2:01:13; Courtroom: 3B; The Court scheduled these proceedings regarding Counsels' Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order #9 . The Court hears the remarks of Counsel. IT IS ORDERED: Counsels' Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order #9 is GRANTED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/6/2019. Re: #9 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery Hearing set for 9/11/2019 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LAA)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Celedon Trucking Services, Inc. (Hanseen, Tye)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Vaughn Nathaniel Johnson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Korrey, David)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Celedon Trucking Services, Inc.. (Hanseen, Tye)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, Defendant Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint filed by Celedon Trucking Services, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/8/2019.(Hanseen, Tye) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Celedon Trucking Services, Inc.. (Hanseen, Tye)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Celedon Trucking Services, Inc.. (Hanseen, Tye)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Celedon Trucking Services, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hanseen, Tye)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/17/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/1/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 17, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-19-796726-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5627221) by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanseen, Tye) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Slaughter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles R. Slaughter, II
Represented By: Tye S. Hanseen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celedon Trucking Services, Inc.
Represented By: Tye S. Hanseen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaughn Nathaniel Johnson
Represented By: David M. Korrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?