Braunstein v. Dzurenda
Petitioner: Steven Braunstein
Respondent: James Dzurenda
Case Number: 2:2019cv01253
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Order, #6 Judgment, filed by Petitioner Steven Braunstein. Filing Fee NOT Paid. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (ADR)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Steven Braunstein. (ADR)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 8/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 petitioner's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall DETACH and FILE #1 -1 the petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the petition is DISMISSED with prejudice as a successive petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #3 petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall ENTER JUDGMENT accordingly and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE re Financial Certificate, filed by Steven Braunstein re #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ADR)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, filed by Petitioner Steven Braunstein. (ADR)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 USCA Order)(JQC)
July 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braunstein v. Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Braunstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?