Maravilla v. Global Equity Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cesar Z. Maravilla
Defendant: Global Equity Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01256
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Carl W Hoffman
2 Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Global Equity Holdings, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Joseph Yakubik for Global Equity Holdings, Inc. added. (Rickard, Jarrod)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding ECF No. #8 . Document is not in compliance with LR IA 10-2 and #4 Clerk's Notice, which states: All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01256-GMN-DJA. Counsel is advised to correct the case number before filing any future documents to be in compliance with #4Clerks Notice. No further action is required to documents #8 at this time. (no image attached) (DKJ)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Global Equity Holdings, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/10/2019.(Rickard, Jarrod) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Global Equity Holdings, Inc. re #6 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. (ADR)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Cesar Z. Maravilla. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Krieger, Esq, #2 Exhibit Proposed Default) (Krieger, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cesar Z. Maravilla re #3 Summons Issued. Global Equity Holdings, Inc. served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Krieger, David) Modified on 9/18/2019 (MMM).
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01256-GMN-DJA. (no image attached) (ADR)
July 22, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Global Equity Holdings, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (MR)
July 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (MR)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cesar Z. Maravilla. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5630705) by Cesar Z. Maravilla. Proof of service due by 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Collect Source)(Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maravilla v. Global Equity Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Equity Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence J Semenza, III
Represented By: Jarrod L. Rickard
Represented By: Christopher D Kircher
Represented By: Katie Lynn Cannata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Z. Maravilla
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Charles Geisendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?