Miller et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jenna Miller and Blake Miller
Defendant: United Sates of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv01293
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by United Sates of America. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/27/2019.(Smith, Brianna) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Blake Miller, Jenna Miller. (Jacob, Tom)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting #25 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jamal K Alsaffar and approving Designation of Local Counsel Danial O. Laird. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/16/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #24 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tom Jacob and approving Designation of Local Counsel Danial O. Laird. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/16/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jamal K. Alsaffar and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Danial Laird (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5667451) by Plaintiffs Blake Miller, Jenna Miller. (Laird, Danial)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Tom Jacob and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Danial Laird (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5667421) by Plaintiffs Blake Miller, Jenna Miller. (Laird, Danial)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Tom Jacob and Jamal K Alsaffar to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/22/2019. (no image attached) (ADR)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #21 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. United Sates of America answer due 9/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #1 Complaint; filed by Defendant United Sates of America. (Smith, Brianna)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #19 Stipulation to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Fred Turner Hinrichs terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION to Substitute Counsel; filed by Defendant United Sates of America. (Smith, Brianna)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/26/2019. This action was received on* 7/26/2019* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* Southern District of Texas* and assigned case number 2:19-cv-01293-APG-VCF. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 8/25/2019. Verified Petition due by 9/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-02072. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received. (MR)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to US District Court for Nevada, Las Vegas Division (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/26/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Transfer Case to US Distict Court, Las Vegas Division, Navada.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/26/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Interdistrict transfer to US District Court of Nevada, Las Vegas Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 7/26/2019, filed. (jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/26/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SURREPLY to #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court of Nevada, Las Vegas Division, filed by Blake Miller, Jenna Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Letter to Gov't Counsel, #2 Exhibit 2. Email from Gov't Counsel)(Jacob, Tom) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/26/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPLY in Support of #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court of Nevada, Las Vegas Division, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hinrichs, Fred) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/26/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court of Nevada, Las Vegas Division, filed by Blake Miller, Jenna Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Declaration of Jenna Miller, #2 Exhibit 2. Emails, #3 Proposed Order)(Jacob, Tom) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/26/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court of Nevada, Las Vegas Division by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Plaintiffs' Administrative Claims, #2 Judge's Procedures Certificate of Conference, #3 Proposed Order)(Hinrichs, Fred) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/26/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Hinrichs, Fred) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/26/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019, filed.(Jacob, Tom) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/26/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/12/2019, filed.(Jacob, Tom) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/26/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Financial Interest by Blake Miller, Jenna Miller, filed. (Jacob, Tom) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/26/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tom Jacob on behalf of Blake Miller, Jenna Miller, filed. (Jacob, Tom) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/26/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney Ryan K. Patrick and U.S. Attorney General Willaim Barr, parties notified via NEF, filed.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/26/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/26/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Attorney General of the US, Assistant US Attorney, filed.(Alsaffar, Jamal) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/26/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22568969) filed by Blake Miller, Jenna Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Alsaffar, Jamal) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna Miller
Represented By: Jamal K Alsaffar
Represented By: Tom Jacob
Represented By: Jamal Khalid Alsaffar
Represented By: Danial O. Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Miller
Represented By: Jamal K Alsaffar
Represented By: Tom Jacob
Represented By: Jamal Khalid Alsaffar
Represented By: Danial O. Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Sates of America
Represented By: Fred Turner Hinrichs
Represented By: Brianna Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?