Lopez v. Williams et al
Petitioner: Mario Alejandro Lopez
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Brian E Williams
Case Number: 2:2019cv01308
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender, through T. Kenneth Lee, Esq., is appointed as counsel for petitioner Mario Lopez under 18 U.S.C. 3006A(a)(2) (B). Amended Petition due within 90 days. See Order for further specifications. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 30, 2019 Attorney update in case: Attorney Rene Valladares withdrawn from the case. (Lee, Thomas)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas Kenneth Lee on behalf of Petitioner Mario Alejandro Lopez. (Lee, Thomas)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Natasha M. Gebrael on behalf of Respondents Attorney General of the State of Nevada, Brian E Williams. (Gebrael, Natasha)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 Lopez's application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #2 Lopez's motion for appointment of counsel is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender shall be provisionally appointed as counsel and shall have 30 days to undertake direct representation of Lopez or to indicate the office's inability to represent him in these proceedings. See Order for further specifications. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Lopez, the Nevada Attorney General, the Federal Public Defender, and the CJA Coordinator - ADR)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Brian E Williams, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:19-cv-01308-APG-NJK. (ADR)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, filed by Petitioner Mario Alejandro Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Appointment (Different form) )(ADR)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Petitioner Mario Alejandro Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(ADR)
July 29, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mario Alejandro Lopez
Represented By: Thomas Kenneth Lee
Represented By: Rene Valladares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Represented By: Natasha M. Gebrael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian E Williams
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Represented By: Natasha M. Gebrael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?