Price v. Saul
Plaintiff: Tinisha Price
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv01319
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #5 Complaint and #6 Summons Issued as Attorney General. (SLD)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #5 Complaint and #6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (SLD)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Jaime Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #5 Complaint and #6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. Served on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/19/2019. (SLD)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS (#7017 3380 00004606 0214 and #7017 3380 0000 4606 2119) re #5 Complaint and #6 Summons Issued. (SLD)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (SLD)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Tinisha Price. Proof of service due by 11/14/2019.(SLD)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint. The Clerk of Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail. The Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/16/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01319-RFB-EJY. (no image attached) (JM)
July 30, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (DKJ)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tinisha Price. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Safa, Cyrus)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tinisha Price. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Safa, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tinisha Price
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Represented By: Gerald Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?