DelVecchia v. Frontier Airlines
Plaintiff: Peter DelVecchia
Defendant: Frontier Airlines
Case Number: 2:2019cv01322
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Brian Maye and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Charles Michalek (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5716210) by Defendant Frontier Airlines. (Michalek, Charles)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Tara Shelke and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Charles Michalek (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5716190) by Defendant Frontier Airlines. (Michalek, Charles)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #11 Motion to Strike, by Defendant Frontier Airlines. (Michalek, Charles)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY to Response to #10 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Frontier Airlines. (Michalek, Charles)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John D. McKay for Peter DelVecchia and approving Designation of Local Counsel Timothy R. Titolo. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/13/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Strike, by Plaintiff Peter DelVecchia. Replies due by 9/19/2019. (Titolo, Timothy)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Peter DelVecchia. Replies due by 9/19/2019. (Titolo, Timothy)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE - Regarding violation of the Local Rules and Attorney Action required as to documents #16 and #17 . ERROR: Documents not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Timothy Titolo. CORRECTION Attorney Timothy Titolo advised to refile documents #16 and #17 using the correct RESPONSE to Motion event in accordance with LR 2-2(c), and properly linked newly filed responses to corresponding Motion in accordance with LR IC 2-2(d). Documents #16 and #17 are terminated as filed in error, pursuant to LR IC 7-1. (no image attached) (RFJ)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ERROR: Document not filed per LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Timothy Titolo. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile document using the correct event in accordance with the local rules. MEMORANDUM to #11 Motion to Strike, by Plaintiff Peter DelVecchia. (Titolo, Timothy) Document #16 terminated as filed in error, pursuant to LR IC 7-1 on 9/12/2019 (RFJ).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ERROR: Document not filed per LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Timothy Titolo. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile document using the correct event in accordance with the local rules. MEMORANDUM to #10 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Peter DelVecchia. (Titolo, Timothy) Document #16 terminated as filed in error, pursuant to LR IC 7-1 on 9/12/2019 (RFJ).
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #12 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition by Plaintiff Peter DelVecchia. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Titolo, Timothy)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John D. McKay and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Timothy R. Titolo (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5692374) by Plaintiff Peter DelVecchia. (Titolo, Timothy)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #12 MOTION/PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. Document is not notarized on page 4 and a signature is missing on page 5. Counsel is advised to correct and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #12 . (no image attached) (EDS)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 VIEW #15 corrected image re MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John D. McKay and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Timothy R. Titolo (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5687232) by Plaintiff Peter DelVecchia. (Titolo, Timothy)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Partially Strike re #1 Complaint Defendant Frontier Airlines, Inc.'s Partial Motion to Strike re #6 Motion , by Defendant Frontier Airlines. Responses due by 9/12/2019. (Michalek, Charles) Modified event and docket entry relationship on 8/29/2019 (DKJ).
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Partial Dismissal by Defendant Frontier Airlines. Responses due by 9/12/2019. (Michalek, Charles) Modified event and docket entry relationship on 8/29/2019 (DKJ).
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of the local rules and Attorney Action Required to document #6 - ERROR: Document #6 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Charles Michalek. Attorney is advised, pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b) for each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. CORRECTION: Attorney Charles Michalek is advised to refile the additional cause of action as Motion to Strike using the correct event separately, in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b), LR IC 2-2(c) and FRCP 7. Additionally, attorney advised to link newly filed Motion to the corresponding document already filed, pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). (no image attached) (RFJ)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Frontier Airlines that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Frontier Airlines Holdings, Inc. for Frontier Airlines added. (Michalek, Charles)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Frontier Airlines. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/12/2019.(Michalek, Charles) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss re #1 Complaint; filed by Defendant Frontier Airlines. Responses due by 9/11/2019. (Michalek, Charles) Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b) by attorney Charles Michalek. Attorney advised to file documents in accordance with the local rules on 8/29/2019 (RFJ).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Peter DelVecchia. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Titolo, Timothy)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Peter DelVecchia. (Titolo, Timothy)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Frontier Airlines. (JM)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff Peter DelVecchia. (Titolo, Timothy)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frontier Airlines by Peter DelVecchia. Proof of service due by 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DelVecchia v. Frontier Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter DelVecchia
Represented By: John Douglas McKay
Represented By: Timothy Titolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Airlines
Represented By: Charles Michalek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?