BE Labs, Inc. v. Securifi, Inc.
Plaintiff: BE Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Securifi, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01387
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (JM)
September 18, 2019 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff BE Labs, Inc.. Without Prejudice (Borghese, Mark)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation; Securifi, Inc. answer due 10/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Neil J. McNabnay, Ricardo J. Bonilla, Lance E. Wyatt, Jr. to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/19/2019. (no image attached) (MMM)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff BE Labs, Inc.. (Borghese, Mark) Modified on 9/4/2019 to add docket entry relationship (MMM).
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01387-GMN-BNW. (no image attached) (EDS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/13/2019. The Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon is no longer assigned to this case. Pursuant to General Order No. 2011-03, IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment to one of the designated patent pilot program judges for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (JM)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Securifi, Inc. (JM)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Isaac Rabicoff to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/27/2019. (no image attached) (JM)
August 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (JM)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by BE Labs, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Borghese, Mark)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5661620) by BE Labs, Inc.. Proof of service due by 11/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Patent No. 7,827,581, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Patent No. 9,344,183, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Charts Comparing the Exemplary '581 Patent Claims to the Exemplary Securifi Products, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Charts Comparing the Exemplary '183 Patent Claims to the Exemplary Securifi Products, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Proposed AO 120 Report)(Borghese, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BE Labs, Inc. v. Securifi, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securifi, Inc.
Represented By: Ricardo J. Bonilla
Represented By: Lance E. Wyatt
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BE Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R. Borghese
Represented By: Isaac Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?