Skywalker Holdings, LLC v. Red Rock Sourcing, LLC
Plaintiff: SKYWALKER HOLDINGS, LLC, a Utah limited liability company and Skywalker Holdings, LLC
Defendant: RED ROCK SOURCING, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, and DOES 1-10 and Red Rock Sourcing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01401
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01401-GMN-VCF. (no image attached) (DKJ)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/19/2019. The Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey is no longer assigned to this case. Pursuant to General Order No. 2011-03, IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment to one of the designated patent pilot program judges for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JQC)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Red Rock Sourcing, LLC re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
August 15, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (JQC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff SKYWALKER Holdings, LLC. (Kunimoto, Bryce)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by SKYWALKER HOLDINGS, LLC, a Utah limited liability company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kunimoto, Bryce)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5664814) by SKYWALKER HOLDINGS, LLC, a Utah limited liability company. Proof of service due by 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Kunimoto, Bryce) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skywalker Holdings, LLC v. Red Rock Sourcing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RED ROCK SOURCING, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, and DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Rock Sourcing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SKYWALKER HOLDINGS, LLC, a Utah limited liability company
Represented By: Bryce K. Kunimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skywalker Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Bryce K. Kunimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?