Bradley v. Total Facility Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Ann Bradley
Defendant: Cool Air Refrigeration Inc. and C-2 Development, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Total Facility Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01413
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (ADR)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #29 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Motions due by 3/16/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/3/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 2, 2019 Filing 29 Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by ThirdParty Plaintiff Total Facility Inc.. (Jaffe, Steven)
September 23, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cool Air Refrigeration Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Upson, Stacey)
September 23, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Petition for Removal,,, Third Party Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Cool Air Refrigeration Inc..(Upson, Stacey)
September 23, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cool Air Refrigeration Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Upson, Stacey)
September 23, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Cool Air Refrigeration Inc..(Upson, Stacey)
September 23, 2019 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #23 , #22 were not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning these documents at this time. (no image attached) (DKJ)
September 23, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cool Air Refrigeration Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Smith, Karl)
September 23, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Petition for Removal,,, Third Party Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Cool Air Refrigeration Inc..(Smith, Karl)
September 23, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cool Air Refrigeration Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Smith, Karl)
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Cool Air Refrigeration Inc..(Smith, Karl)
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Total Facility Inc.. Cool Air Refrigeration Inc. served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (Anderson, Taylor)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Ann Bradley re #13 Amended Complaint, #15 Summons Issued. Cool Air Refrigeration Inc. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Smith, Christian)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Total Facility Inc.. (Anderson, Taylor)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/20/2019.), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Cool Air Refrigeration Inc. by Total Facility Inc.. filed by Total Facility Inc..(Anderson, Taylor) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Cool Air Refrigeration Inc. re #13 Amended Complaint. (ADR)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Cool Air Refrigeration, Inc. by Plaintiff Deborah Ann Bradley. (Smith, Christian)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Cool Air Refrigeration Inc. by Deborah Ann Bradley. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 11/20/2019.(Smith, Christian)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by ThirdParty Plaintiff Total Facility Inc.. (Anderson, Taylor)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation to Amend to Add Cool Air Refrigeration, Inc as a Defendant. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Amend Complaint re: #1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL by Plaintiff Deborah Ann Bradley. (Smith, Christian)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #6 Minute Order Removal Case, by ThirdParty Plaintiff Total Facility Inc.. (Jaffe, Steven)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Total Facility Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Jaffe, Steven)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Deborah Ann Bradley. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Smith, Christian)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/16/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/31/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cool Air Refrigeration Inc. re #1 -2 Third Party Complaint. (ADR)
August 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ADR)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Defendant Total Facility Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jaffe, Steven)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #2 Summons Returned Executed. The wrong event was selected. Counsel is advised to refile using the appropriate docket entry event, "Proposed Summons to be Issued". (no image attached) (EDS)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 ERROR: Incorrect event selected. Counsel advised to refile using proper event.SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Total Facility Inc. as to Cool Air Refrigeration Inc. (Jaffe, Steven)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-17-766972-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5666901) by Total Facility Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jaffe, Steven) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Total Facility Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Ann Bradley
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Represented By: Christian Z Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cool Air Refrigeration Inc.
Represented By: Karl H. Smith
Represented By: Stacey A. Upson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C-2 Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Total Facility Inc.
Represented By: Steven T. Jaffe
Represented By: Taylor Robert Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?