Serhiyenko v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tetyana Serhiyenko
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01421
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM)
October 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #18 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 3/3/2020. Motions due by 4/2/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Tetyana Serhiyenko. (Gliner, Mitchell)
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Trans Union LLC.(Bergh, Jennifer)
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC added. (Thompson, Jeremy)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #1 Complaint. Trans Union LLC answer due 9/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Trans Union LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Trans Union Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., for Trans Union LLC added. (Bergh, Jennifer)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Rebecca Bergh on behalf of Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. added. (Olson, Bob)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/20/2019.(Olson, Bob) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tetyana Serhiyenko re #2 Summons Issued. Trans Union LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Gliner, Mitchell)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tetyana Serhiyenko re #2 Summons Issued. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Gliner, Mitchell)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Equifax Information Services LLC on 8/20/2019 executed by Tetyana Serhiyenko. (Gliner, Mitchell)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #4 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #4 using the appropriate docket entry title "Acceptance of Service". Also, Summons Returned Executed should be filed pursuant to FRCP Rule 4. (no image attached) (DKJ)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 ERROR: Incorrect event selected by attorney. Attorney advised to refile correctly. Document #4 terminated. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tetyana Serhiyenko re #2 Summons Issued. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Gliner, Mitchell)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tetyana Serhiyenko. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gliner, Mitchell)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union LLC re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
August 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5668241) by Tetyana Serhiyenko. Proof of service due by 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Gliner, Mitchell) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serhiyenko v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Jeremy J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Charles E Gianelloni
Represented By: Bob L. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Rebecca Bergh
Represented By: Trevor Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tetyana Serhiyenko
Represented By: Mitchell D Gliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?