Gamboa-Garcia v. Sebring Capital Partners, Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Catarina Gamboa-Garcia
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA N.A., Western Progressive-Nevada, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation and Sebring Capital Partners, Limited Partnership
Case Number: 2:2019cv01430
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/25/2020. Motions due by 3/26/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Catarina Gamboa-Garcia. (McDonnell, Patrick)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Minute Order Dated August 19, 2019 by Defendants HSBC Bank USA N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Allison, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Non-Monetary Status re #2 Certificate of Interested Parties,, by Defendant Western Progressive-Nevada, Inc.. (Allison, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patrick C. McDonnell on behalf of Plaintiff Catarina Gamboa-Garcia. (McDonnell, Patrick)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants HSBC Bank USA N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Allison, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by HSBC Bank USA N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/13/2019.(Allison, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 8/19/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/3/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by HSBC Bank USA N.A., as Trustee on Behalf of ACE Securities Corp. Home Equity Loan Trust and for the Registered Holders of ACE Securities Corp. Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-HE1 Asset Backed Pass-Through, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Western Progressive-Nevada, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Altisource Solutions S.a.r.l. for Western Progressive-Nevada, Inc.; Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation added. (Allison, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-19-798420-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5669459) by HSBC Bank USA N.A., as Trustee on Behalf of ACE Securities Corp. Home Equity Loan Trust and for the Registered Holders of ACE Securities Corp. Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-HE1 Asset Backed Pass-Through, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Western Progressive-Nevada, Inc., PHH Mortgage Corporation. Proof of service due by 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Certificate of Service)(Allison, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamboa-Garcia v. Sebring Capital Partners, Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catarina Gamboa-Garcia
Represented By: Terry A. Coffing
Represented By: Patrick C. McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA N.A.
Represented By: Jeffrey S Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive-Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey S Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sebring Capital Partners, Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?