Ritchie et al v. Clark County School District et al
Plaintiff: J. M. R., Bradley Scott Ritchie and Connor James Ritchie
Defendant: Randy Cheung, Karen Bennett, Mamie R. Hubbard-Washington and Clark County School District
Case Number: 2:2019cv01480
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re #16 Order for Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs J. M. R., Bradley Scott Ritchie, Connor James Ritchie. (Dennett, Ryan)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint proposed discovery plan no later than 10/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Karen Bennett, Randy Cheung, Clark County School District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Letter) (Hendricks, Kara)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT re: Removal; filed by Plaintiffs J. M. R., Bradley Scott Ritchie, Connor James Ritchie. (Dennett, Ryan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs J. M. R., Bradley Scott Ritchie, Connor James Ritchie. Replies due by 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ferguson Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit Doug Ritchie, #3 Exhibit Doc 1-1 Complaint) (Dennett, Ryan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Mamie R. Hubbard-Washington re Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal. (MR)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued MAMIE HUBBARD-WASHINGTON by Plaintiffs J. M. R., Bradley Scott Ritchie, Connor James Ritchie. (Truman, T)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying without prejudice #4 Motion for Service by Publication. The Court will instead EXTEND the deadline to effectuate service on Ms. Hubbard-Washington to 11/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Ryan L Dennett on behalf of Plaintiffs J. M. R., Bradley Scott Ritchie, Connor James Ritchie. (Dennett, Ryan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Karen Bennett, Randy Cheung, Clark County School District. (Welch-Kirmse, Whitney)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Karen Bennett, Randy Cheung, Clark County School District. Responses due by 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Police Report, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Criminal Complaint) (Hendricks, Kara)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by J. M. R., Bradley Scott Ritchie, Connor James Ritchie. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Truman, T)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiffs J. M. R., Bradley Scott Ritchie, Connor James Ritchie. (Truman, T)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Service by Publication of Summons for Defendant Mamie Hubbard-Washington by Plaintiffs J. M. R., Bradley Scott Ritchie, Connor James Ritchie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Truman, T)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 8/26/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/10/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 23, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Karen Bennett, Randy Cheung, Clark County School District. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hendricks, Kara)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-797208-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5677588) by Clark County School District, Randy Cheung, Karen Bennett. Proof of service due by 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B -- Acceptance of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hendricks, Kara) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ritchie et al v. Clark County School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. M. R.
Represented By: T James Truman
Represented By: Ryan L Dennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Scott Ritchie
Represented By: T James Truman
Represented By: Ryan L Dennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connor James Ritchie
Represented By: T James Truman
Represented By: Ryan L Dennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Cheung
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Whitney Welch-Kirmse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Bennett
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Whitney Welch-Kirmse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mamie R. Hubbard-Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County School District
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Whitney Welch-Kirmse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?