Blandburg v. Advanced Lighting and Electric, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rashaud Blandburg
Defendant: Advanced Lighting and Electric, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01519
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Advanced Lighting and Electric, Inc.. Responses due by 11/6/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/7/2019. (Lovato, Mario) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rashaud Blandburg re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. Advanced Lighting and Electric, Inc. served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Foley, Jenny)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Advanced Lighting and Electric, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Rashaud Blandburg. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Foley, Jenny)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 First COMPLAINT against Advanced Lighting and Electric, Inc., a Nevada Domestic Corporation, Does I-X; Roe Corporations I-X. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5686169) by Rashaud Blandburg. Proof of service due by 11/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons to be issued)(Foley, Jenny) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 30, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blandburg v. Advanced Lighting and Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashaud Blandburg
Represented By: Jenny L Foley
Represented By: Marta D. Kurshumova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Lighting and Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Mario P. Lovato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?