SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A. and Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv01534
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to #47 Motion to Strike by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Gerrard, Douglas)
August 28, 2020 Filing 48 RESPONSE to #47 Motion to Strike by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC.. Replies due by 9/4/2020. (Ebron, Diana)
August 14, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION to Strike #46 Reply by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.. Responses due by 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Gerrard, Douglas)
July 31, 2020 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to #38 Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Trial Testimony of Douglas Miles) (Ebron, Diana)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #39 Proposed STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Re: #38 Motion for Reconsideration. Responses due by 7/24/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 24, 2020 Filing 44 RESPONSE to #38 Motion for Reconsideration by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.. Replies due by 7/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Gerrard, Douglas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #39 Stipulation by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Gerrard, Douglas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 42 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #41 . The document is still incorrect regarding the Judge's signature block. Pursuant to LR IA 6-2: The signature block must not begin on a separate page. Attorney Douglas Gerrard is advised to file the corrected document using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #39 . (no image attached) (SLD)
July 16, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #39 Stipulation, by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Gerrard, Douglas)
July 16, 2020 Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 7/16/2020 Re: #39 Stipulation. Document #39 does not include a properly formatted Order. Attorney Action required - Attorney Douglas Gerrard is advised to file a properly formatted proposed order in accordance with LR IA 6-2 with the Stipulation, using the correct event Notice of Corrected Image and properly link newly filed Notice to document #39 pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) and LR IC 2-2(d). (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 16, 2020 Filing 39 VIEW Corrected Image #43 re: Proposed STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #38 Motion for Reconsideration, by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A. (Gerrard, Douglas) Modified on 7/17/2020 (SLD).
July 3, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Reconsideration re #37 Judgment, #36 Order, by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Responses due by 7/17/2020. (Ebron, Diana)
June 11, 2020 Filing 37 JUDGMENT in favor of Bank Of America, N.A. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 6/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting #17 BANA's Motion for Summary Judgment, Denying #13 SFR's Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk is instructed to enter Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting ECF No. #34 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Tenesa S. Powell terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 27, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to remove attorney Tenesa S. Powell, Esq. from the Electronic Service List in this case by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A. (Garner, Rex)
March 18, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF ENTRY re STIPULATION TO STAY CASE 60 DAYS by Bank Of America, N.A. re #32 Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Gerrard, Douglas) .
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Stipulation to Temporarily Stay Case and reset deadlines. Discovery will be 60 days after the end of the 60-day stay, and the scheduling order deadlines will be extended to the following. Discovery due by 7/28/2020. Motions due by 8/27/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified on 3/18/2020 (SLD).
March 16, 2020 Filing 31 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Stay Case 60 Days by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A. (Gerrard, Douglas)
March 9, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rex Garner on behalf of Defendant Bank Of America, N.A. (Garner, Rex)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #27 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/19/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 18, 2020 Filing 28 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #27 Stipulated Protective Order by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A. (Gerrard, Douglas)
February 18, 2020 Filing 27 Proposed STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A. (Gerrard, Douglas)
January 30, 2020 Filing 26 Joint STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO LR 26-3 by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.. (Gerrard, Douglas)
December 20, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #17 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.. (Gerrard, Douglas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #17 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Replies due by 12/20/2019. (Gilbert, Jacqueline)
December 6, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #13 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. (Gilbert, Jacqueline)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #21 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #13 Motion for Summary Judgment. SFR's Replies due by 12/6/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 2, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #13 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. (Martinez, Jason)
November 21, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (SLD)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #18 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/30/2020. Motions due by 4/29/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 19, 2019 Filing 18 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. (Ebron, Diana)
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.. Responses due by 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Gerrard, Douglas)
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #15 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b). For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Counsel is advised to file ONLY the Motion for Summary Judgement located in ECF No. #15 as a separate filing to be in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by filing two separate documents for each request or purpose. DO NOT refile the Response. (no image attached) (DKJ)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #13 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.. Replies due by 11/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Gerrard, Douglas)
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Douglas D. Gerrard on behalf of Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.. (Gerrard, Douglas)
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment; filed by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Responses due by 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Jason G. Martinez, #2 Exhibit B Declaration of Christopher J. Hardin) (Martinez, Jason)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to #9 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.. (Powell, Tenesa)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Replies due by 10/24/2019. (Martinez, Jason)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bank Of America, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank Of America, N.A. added. (Powell, Tenesa)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.. Responses due by 10/17/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C) (Powell, Tenesa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tenesa S Powell on behalf of Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.. (Powell, Tenesa)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC re #4 Summons Issued. Bank Of America, N.A. served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Martinez, Jason)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Amended CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent SFR Investments, LLC, Corporate Parent SFR Funding, LLC, Corporate Parent Xiemen Limited Partnership, Corporate Parent Xiemen Investments, Ltd., Corporate Parent John Gibson for SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC added. (Ebron, Diana)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ebron, Diana)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bank Of America, N.A. re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. (Ebron, Diana)
September 3, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (SLD)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. (Ebron, Diana)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank Of America, N.A. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5687893) by SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Proof of service due by 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ebron, Diana) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A.
Represented By: Tenesa S Powell
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Represented By: Rex Garner
Represented By: Fredrick J Biedermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Tenesa S Powell
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Represented By: Rex Garner
Represented By: Fredrick J Biedermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana S. Ebron
Represented By: Jason G. Martinez
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Gilbert
Represented By: Karen L. Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?