Toromanova v. Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB et al
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Appellant: Dimitritza H Toromanova
Appellee: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Kathleen Leavitt and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv01575
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #12 . Attorney Danielle N. Gueck-Townsend is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
November 2, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #12 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Danielle N. Gueck-Townsend and Sarah Smith. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 OPENING BRIEF by Appellant Dimitritza H Toromanova. (JM)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remove Trustee as a Party Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21 by Appellee Kathleen Leavitt. Responses due by 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Discharging Trustee and Closing of Dismissed Case, #2 Exhibit 2- Order Granting Motion to Reopen Debtor's Bankruptcy Case) (Smith, Sarah)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramir Mitchell Hernandez, R. Samuel Ehlers on behalf of Appellee U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Hernandez, Ramir)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/18/2019. IT IS ORDERED that the appellant shall have a period of 14 days from the date of this order to file/serve an opening brief. Appellee shall have 14 days after to file/serve an answering brief. Thereafter, appellant shall have 14 days to file/serve a final reply brief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall file and serve excerpts of the record as an appendix to the appellant brief pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(b) and LR IC 2-2. Appellee may also file/serve an appendix with appellee brief which contains required material omitted by appellant. Opening brief due by 11/1/2019. Answering brief due by 11/15/2019. Reply brief due by 11/29/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Readiness. (MR)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE from USBC re #4 Amended Notice of Appeal. (MR)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE re: #4 Amended Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT; filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Chen, Michael) Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) by attorney Michael W. Chen. Court corrected entry on 10/10/2019 (RFJ).
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Chen, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pendency of Action, by Dimitritza H Toromanova. (MR)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Amended Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT, Bankruptcy Court case number 18-15086-abl. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Pendency of Action) (MR)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/10/2019. IT IS ORDERED that the designation of reporters and recorders transcripts (if any) as required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) shall be filed with the clerk of bankruptcy court so the certificate of readiness may be transmitted timely to the district court. If the designation was previously filed with the clerk of BAP, counsel shall file a copy of the same with the clerk of bankruptcy court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future documents filed in connection with this appeal shall bear the bankruptcy case number, adversary case number (if any) and the district court civil case number. For Bankruptcy Appeals, Attorneys are required to file Verified Petitions in accordance with LR IA 11-2. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT, Bankruptcy Court case number 18-15086-abl. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Referral, #2 Transmittal Form, #3 Appeal Memo) (ADR)
September 10, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon. (ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toromanova v. Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dimitritza H Toromanova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Michael W. Chen
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kathleen Leavitt
Represented By: Danielle N Gueck-Townsend
Represented By: Sarah E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: R. Samuel Ehlers
Represented By: Ramir Mitchell Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?