CJCLive, LLC. v. Braziel
Plaintiff: CJCLive, LLC.
Defendant: Reginal Braziel
Case Number: 2:2019cv01593
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE; filed by CJCLive, LLC.. (Lin, Michael)
November 7, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing held on 11/7/2019 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: D. Saavedra; Pla Counsel: Francis Arenas; Def Counsel: Reginal Braziel; Court Reporter: Shayna Montomery; Time of Hearing: 9:09 a.m. -10:22 a.m.; Courtroom: 4A; The Court makes preliminary remarks as to defendant's motions. The motion for leave to file motion to dismiss is not required by the rules. The Court finds that Defendant has consented to the jurisdiction of the Court and accepted service of process. The Court further finds that Plaintiff alleged sufficient facts to state a claim for relief. Therefore, the Court DENIES Defendants Motion to Dismiss #20 . The Court hears representations from counsel as to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 and Application for Order to Show Cause #7 . Mr. Arenas makes representations for plaintiff. Mr. Braziel makes representations. Defense witnesses Maria Lilbeth Digal and Hany Daoud are called to the witness stand. As stated on the record, Plaintiff did not meet the criteria for entry of Preliminary Injunction or for entry of a Writ of Replevin. IT IS ORDERED Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 and Application for Order to Show Cause #7 , are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendant Reginal Braziel is required to file an answer to the complaint. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS) Modified on 11/12/2019 -mailed copy of minutes to Reginal Braziel to address listed 2414 Sullivan, Irvine, CA(DXS).
November 6, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/6/2019. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #20 Motion to Dismiss,,. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 6, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: D. Saavedra; Pla Counsel: Francis Arenas; Def Counsel: Reginal Braziel; Court Reporter: Shayna Montgomery; Time of Hearing: 9:33 a.m. - 9:42 a.m.; Courtroom: 4A; Parties are present. Representations from counsel are heard. Plaintiff needs additional time to review Motion and Responses filed on 11/6/19. Motion Hearing is continued to 11/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4A before Judge Kent J. Dawson. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
November 6, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Reginal Braziel. Responses due by 11/20/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit- Restricted access per LR IC 6-1, #2 Hearing Request)(Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #3 Exhibit Part 2) (ADR). (ADR) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #8 Motion Shorten Time re re 7 Motion for Return of Property, filed by Defendant Reginal Braziel. (ADR)
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #7 Motion for Return of Property, filed by Defendant Reginal Braziel. Replies due by 11/13/2019. (ADR)
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Shorten Time re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendant Reginal Braziel. (ADR)
November 6, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendant Reginal Braziel. Replies due by 11/13/2019. (ADR)
November 5, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, #8 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, #7 Motion for Return of Property by Plaintiff CJCLive, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lin, Michael)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Order by CJCLive, LLC. re #10 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,,,. (Lin, Michael)
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Of Entry of Order by CJCLive, LLC. re #9 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,,,. (Lin, Michael)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by CJCLive, LLC. re #10 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,,,. (Lin, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/4/2019. By Deputy Clerk: D. Saavedra. Re: #7 First MOTION for Return of Property amd #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2019 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 4A before Judge Kent J. Dawson. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #6 Motion to Shorten Time Re: #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing reset for 11/6/2019 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 4A before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Motion to Shorten Time Re: #7 Motion for Return of Property. Motion Hearing reset for 11/6/2019 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 4A before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Shorten Time re #7 Motion for Return of Property by Plaintiff CJCLive, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Lin, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Return of Property by Plaintiff CJCLive, LLC.. Responses due by 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lin, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Shorten Time re #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff CJCLive, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Lin, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; filed by Plaintiff CJCLive, LLC.. Responses due by 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lin, Michael)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CJCLive, LLC.. Reginal Braziel served on 9/29/2019, answer due 10/20/2019. (Lin, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Reginal Braziel re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by CJCLive, LLC.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lin, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ADR)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reginal Braziel (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5699048) by CJCLive, LLC.. Proof of service due by 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Declaration)(Lin, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CJCLive, LLC. v. Braziel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CJCLive, LLC.
Represented By: Michael M Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginal Braziel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?