Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC v. Magix Computer Products International Co.
Plaintiff: Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC
Defendant: Magix Computer Products International Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01610
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Jay Johnson is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jay Johnson for Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC, and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mark R. Borghese. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/29/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jay Johnson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark Borghese (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5755324) by Plaintiff Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC. (Borghese, Mark)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Magix Computer Products International Co. answer due 11/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Magix Computer Products International Co.. (Austin, F.)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. Magix Computer Products International Co. served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Borghese, Mark)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du for all further proceedings in accordance with Patent Pilot Program General Order 2011-03. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01610-MMD-EJY. (no image attached) (RFJ)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/13/2019. The Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon is no longer assigned to this case. Pursuant to General Order No. 2011-03, IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment to one of the designated patent pilot program judges for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLM)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Magix Computer Products International Co. re #1 Complaint. (MR)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jay Johnson to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/27/2019. (no image attached) (MR)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
September 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (MR)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Patent Asset Management, LLC for Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC added. (Borghese, Mark)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5700615) by Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC. Proof of service due by 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Proposed AO 120 Report)(Borghese, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC v. Magix Computer Products International Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rothschild Patent Imaging LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Borghese
Represented By: Jay Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magix Computer Products International Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?