Deocampo v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Estrellita Deocampo
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, TransUnion, LLC, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01625
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by TransUnion, LLC.(Bergh, Jennifer)
November 6, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC added. (Thompson, Jeremy)
November 6, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy)
November 5, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.(Larsen, Kent)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 11/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint. TransUnion, LLC answer due 11/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 31, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Docket Correction to ECF No. #25 : Event changed by Court from Stipulation to Joint Motion; not signed by all parties in case. (no image attached) (MMM)
October 31, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Docket Correction to ECF No. #24 : Event changed by Court from Stipulation to Joint Motion; not signed by all parties in case. (no image attached) (MMM)
October 30, 2019 Filing 25 Joint MOTION STIPULATION For Extension of Time re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) Modified event on 10/31/2019 (MMM).
October 30, 2019 Filing 24 Joint MOTION STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #1 Complaint, by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer) Modified on 10/31/2019 to reflect correct event (MMM).
October 22, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc added. (Larsen, Kent)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #18 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint (Second Request). Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc answer due 11/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. Responses due by 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Bao, Andrew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Bayview Asset Management, LLC for Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC added. (Bao, Andrew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/6/2019.(Bao, Andrew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 21, 2019 Filing 18 SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #1 Complaint, filed by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Larsen, Kent)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #16 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint (Second Request). Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 10/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #1 COMPLAINT; filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying without prejudice #12 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time. TransUnion, LLC answer due 10/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #1 Complaint, filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc answer due 10/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by TransUnion, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion for TransUnion, LLC added. (Bergh, Jennifer)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #1 Complaint, filed by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Rebecca Bergh on behalf of Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estrellita Deocampo re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Plaksin, Shaina)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estrellita Deocampo re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Plaksin, Shaina)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Proposed Order Extending Deadline to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Larsen, Kent)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estrellita Deocampo re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Plaksin, Shaina)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
September 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Estrellita Deocampo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5702944) by Estrellita Deocampo. Proof of service due by 12/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Bayview, #3 Summons Equifax, #4 Summons SPS, #5 Summons TransUnion)(Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deocampo v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Rebecca Bergh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Andrew A. Bao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc
Represented By: Kent F Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estrellita Deocampo
Represented By: Shaina R Plaksin
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?