Goodwin v. John et al
Plaintiff: Julie Goodwin
Defendant: MV John Corporation, Valley Inn Motel, Matthew John and MVJ Car Wash & Laundromat
Case Number: 2:2019cv01642
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Angela J Guingcangco is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (DKJ)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #11 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (DKJ)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Matthew John, MV John Corporation, MVJ Car Wash & Laundromat, Valley Inn Motel. Responses due by 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Renewed Motion to Dismiss) (Dunsmoor, Travis)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/28/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Julie Goodwin. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 1/22/2020.(Schrager, Bradley)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Matthew John, MV John Corporation, MVJ Car Wash & Laundromat, Valley Inn Motel. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Dunsmoor, Travis)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Matthew John, MV John Corporation, MVJ Car Wash & Laundromat, Valley Inn Motel. Responses due by 10/29/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Motion to Dismiss) (Dunsmoor, Travis) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Goodwin re #1 Complaint,. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Schrager, Bradley)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Matthew John, MV John Corporation, MVJ Car Wash & Laundromat, Valley Inn Motel re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Julie Goodwin. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Schrager, Bradley)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Julie Goodwin. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Schrager, Bradley)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5706975) by Julie Goodwin. Proof of service due by 12/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Schrager, Bradley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 18, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. John et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MV John Corporation
Represented By: Travis H. Dunsmoor
Represented By: Jedediah Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Inn Motel
Represented By: Travis H. Dunsmoor
Represented By: Jedediah Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew John
Represented By: Travis H. Dunsmoor
Represented By: Jedediah Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVJ Car Wash & Laundromat
Represented By: Travis H. Dunsmoor
Represented By: Jedediah Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Goodwin
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Represented By: Angela J Guingcangco
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Angela Jill Guingcangco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?