Rodriguez v. Nieves et al
Plaintiff: Jose Rodriguez
Defendant: James Dzurenda, Lt Matousik, Michael Nieves and M. Hubbard-Pickett
Case Number: 2:2019cv01644
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff shall either: (1) file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or (2) pay the full $400 fee for filing a civil action by 11/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Obtain Financial Certificate re #3 Order by Plaintiff Jose Rodriguez. (SLD)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court WILL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. File a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or Payment of filing fees due 10/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Encl.: application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner w/ instructions - ADR) Modified on 9/20/2019 to specify enclosure - (ADR).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (SLD)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (SLD)
September 18, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Nieves et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Matousik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Hubbard-Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?