Martinez v. James River Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Juan Jose Martinez
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01646
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Weinerman, Deleela)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule For Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #8 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/18/2020. Motions due by 6/17/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Weinerman, Deleela)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by James River Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/11/2019.(Weinerman, Deleela) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/19/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Christensen, Jared)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by James River Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent JAMES RIVER GROUP, INC., Corporate Parent JAMES RIVER GROUP HOLDINGS, LTD, Corporate Parent BERMUDA for James River Insurance Company added. (Christensen, Jared)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Christensen, Jared)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-796926-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5707901) by James River Insurance Company. (Christensen, Jared) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. James River Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Jose Martinez
Represented By: Ryan Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Deleela M. Ivey Weinerman
Represented By: Jared G Christensen
Represented By: Lucian Greco, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?