Universal Entertainment Corporation v. Aruze Gaming America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Universal Entertainment Corporation
Defendant: Aruze Gaming America, Inc. and Kazuo Okada
Case Number: 2:2019cv01657
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE 2:18-cv-00585-RFB-NJK by Universal Entertainment Corporation. (Schuttert, Jay) Modified event on 10/30/2019 (MMM).
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Universal Entertainment Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Schuttert, Jay)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (JM)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (JM)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (JM)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (JM)
September 20, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (JM)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Universal Entertainment Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5710545) by Universal Entertainment Corporation. Proof of service due by 12/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibits List, #2 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. D573,200 (the 200 Patent), #3 Exhibit 2 - Patent Prosecution History of 200, #4 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. D573,201 (the 201 Patent), #5 Exhibit 4 - Patent Prosecution History of 201, #6 Exhibit 5 - U.S. Patent No. 8,083,582 (the 582 Patent), #7 Exhibit 6 - Patent Prosecution History of 582, #8 Exhibit 7 - U.S. Patent No. 8,235,790 (the 790 Patent), #9 Exhibit 8 - Patent Prosecution History of 790, #10 Exhibit 9 - U.S. Patent No. 8,480,479 (the 479 Patent), #11 Exhibit 10 - Patent Prosecution History of 479, #12 Exhibit 11 - U.S. Patent No. 8,523,656 (the 656 Patent), #13 Exhibit 12 - Patent Prosecution History of 656, #14 Exhibit 13 - U.S. Patent No. 8,684,816 (the 816 Patent), #15 Exhibit 14 - Patent Prosecution History of 816, #16 Exhibit 15 - U.S. Reissue Patent No. 46,767 (the 767 Patent), #17 Exhibit 16 - Patent Prosecution History of 767, #18 Exhibit 17 - U.S. Reissue Patent No. 46,808 (the 808 Patent), #19 Exhibit 18 - Patent Prosecution History of 808, #20 Exhibit 19 - 582 Infringement Claim Chart: COAT OF ARMS GRIFFIN, #21 Exhibit 20 - 582 Infringement Claim Chart: FEATURE RUSH ANUBIS, #22 Exhibit 21 - 582 Infringement Claim Chart: FU LU SHOU, #23 Exhibit 22 - 582 Infringement Claim Chart: JUNGLE CASH ULTRA STACK BEAUTY IN THE WILD, #24 Exhibit 23 - 582 Infringement Claim Chart: STACKIN WEALTH, #25 Exhibit 24 - 582 Infringement Claim Chart: STREAKING FAMILY, #26 Exhibit 25 - 582 Infringement Claim Chart: ULTRA STACK POSEIDON FAMILY, #27 Exhibit 26 - 790 Infringement Claim Chart: 100LINES STACK FEATURE FAMILY, #28 Exhibit 27 - 790 Infringement Claim Chart: 500G FAMILY, #29 Exhibit 28 - 790 Infringement Claim Chart: ANCIENT WHEEL BIG 5 and ANCIENT WHEEL PANDA, #30 Exhibit 29 - 790 Infringement Claim Chart: GOD FAMILY, #31 Exhibit 30 - 790 Infringement Claim Chart: JIN II FAMILY, #32 Exhibit 31 - 790 Infringement Claim Chart: JUNGLE CASH ULTRA STACK FAMILY, #33 Exhibit 32 - 790 Infringement Claim Chart: MOONLIGHT OWL, #34 Exhibit 33 - 790 Infringement Claim Chart: RAINBOW CASH ULTRA STACK FEATURE FAMILY, #35 Exhibit 34 - 790 Infringement Claim Chart: SPIRIT FAMILY, #36 Exhibit 35 - 790 Infringement Claim Chart: TOWER STACK FAMILY, #37 Exhibit 36 - 790 Infringement Claim Chart: ULTRA STACK FEATURE FAMILY, #38 Exhibit 37 - 479 Infringement Claim Chart: EXTREME FAMILY, #39 Exhibit 38 - 479 Infringement Claim Chart: GOD FAMILY, #40 Exhibit 39 - 479 Infringement Claim Chart: GOLDEN FAMILY, #41 Exhibit 40 - 479 Infringement Claim Chart: MASTER OF WEALTH, #42 Exhibit 41 - 479 Infringement Claim Chart: SHEN LONG FEVER, #43 Exhibit 42 - 479 Infringement Claim Chart: SINBAD, #44 Exhibit 43 - 479 Infringement Claim Chart: ULTIMATE ERUPTION, #45 Exhibit 44 - 479 Infringement Claim Chart: VEGAS CASH FAMILY, #46 Exhibit 45 - 656 Infringement Claim Chart: GODDESSES FAMILY, #47 Exhibit 46 - 816 Infringement Claim Chart: JIN II FAMILY, #48 Exhibit 47 -816 Infringement Claim Chart: SHEN LONG FEVER, #49 Exhibit 48 - 816 Infringement Claim Chart: ULTRA SLIDE RYUKO, #50 Exhibit 49 - 816 Infringement Claim Chart: ULTRA STACK FEATURE AFRICA, #51 Exhibit 50 - 767 Infringement Claim Chart: ALIBABA, #52 Exhibit 51 - 767 Infringement Claim Chart: CYBER SEVEN, #53 Exhibit 52 - 767 Infringement Claim Chart: FU LU SHOU, #54 Exhibit 53 - 767 Infringement Claim Chart: PLATINUM JACKPOT, #55 Exhibit 54 - 767 Infringement Claim Chart: RAPID SHOT FAMILY, #56 Exhibit 55 - 767 Infringement Claim Chart: ULTIMATE DIAMOND, #57 Exhibit 56 - 808 Infringement Claim Chart: ALIBABA, #58 Exhibit 57 - 808 Infringement Claim Chart: CYBER SEVEN, #59 Exhibit 58 - 808 Infringement Claim Chart: FU LU SHOU, #60 Exhibit 59 - 808 Infringement Claim Chart: PLATINUM JACKPOT, #61 Exhibit 60 - 808 Infringement Claim Chart: RAPID SHOT FAMILY, #62 Exhibit 61 - 808 Infringement Claim Chart: ULTIMATE DIAMOND, #63 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schuttert, Jay) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Entertainment Corporation v. Aruze Gaming America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aruze Gaming America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kazuo Okada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Entertainment Corporation
Represented By: Jay Joseph Schuttert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?