Based v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Abdul Based
Respondent: Jean M Kent, Ronald D Vitiello, Donald Trump, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Department of Homeland Security, ICE/DRO K 2383 Quihuis, Kevin McAleenan, William Barr and Claire M Grady
Case Number: 2:2019cv01666
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #15 Motion for Judgment by Respondents William Barr, Department of Homeland Security, Claire M Grady, ICE/DRO K 2383 Quihuis, Jean M Kent, Kevin McAleenan, Donald Trump, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D Vitiello. Replies due by 11/20/2019. (Wenthe, Roger)
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #12 Motion to Dismiss,,, by Respondents William Barr, Department of Homeland Security, Claire M Grady, ICE/DRO K 2383 Quihuis, Jean M Kent, Kevin McAleenan, Donald Trump, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D Vitiello. (Wenthe, Roger)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Judgment, filed by Petitioner Abdul Based. Responses due by 11/18/2019. (ADR)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #11 Order on Motion for TRO by Petitioner Abdul Based. Filing Fee NOT Paid. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Attachments: #1 cover letter) (ADR) (Main Document 14 replaced on 11/5/2019) (ADR).
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/15/2019. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #12 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondents William Barr, Department of Homeland Security, Claire M Grady, ICE/DRO K 2383 Quihuis, Jean M Kent, Kevin McAleenan, Donald Trump, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D Vitiello. Responses due by 10/29/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Wenthe, Roger) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #9 the motion to amend for emergency temporary restraining order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 Certified Mail Returned re #3 Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis. (JQC)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 EMERGENCY AMENDED MOTION for Restraining Order by Petitioner Abdul Based. (SLD)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. USA served on 9/26/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (JM)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT as to Attorney General (2126) re #3 Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis. (JM)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION re Jurisdiction, filed by Petitioner Abdul Based. (ADR
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Petitioner Abdul Based. (ADR)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Abdul Based. (ADR)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 the application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that the clerk of the court file the petition for a writ of habeas corpus, the emergency motion for a temporary restraining order, and the motion regarding jurisdiction. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that the emergency motion for a temporary restraining order is DENIED. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that the motion regarding jurisdiction is DENIED. See Order for further specifications. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM, AUSA, US Attorney William Barr - ADR)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against William Barr, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:19-cv-01666-GMN-DJA. (MR)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Abdul Based. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Motion for TRO, #3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #4 Motion re Jurisdiction) (MR)
September 23, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Based v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jean M Kent
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald D Vitiello
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald Trump
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ICE/DRO K 2383 Quihuis
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Claire M Grady
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abdul Based
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?