Leon Enterprises, Inc. v. Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: Leon Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Melissa Cardenas and Benjamin Gonzalez
Case Number: 2:2019cv01672
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Stipulation; Re: #18 Motion for Judgment. Responses due by 12/2/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 18, 2019 Filing 19 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Plaintiff to respond re #18 Motion for Judgment, by Third Party Defendants Alejandro Leon, Laura Leon. (Hamilton, Ryan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Third Party Plaintiffs Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez, Defendants Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez, Counter Claimants Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez. Responses due by 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Memoradum for Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibits for Motion for Judgment on Pleadings) (Raich, Sagar)
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Alejandro Leon, Laura Leon. (JM)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Laura Leon by Third Party Plaintiffs Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez, Defendants Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez, Counter Claimants Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez. (Raich, Sagar)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Alejandro Leon by Third Party Plaintiffs Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez, Defendants Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez, Counter Claimants Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez. (Raich, Sagar)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 ERROR: Incorrect form used by attorney. Attorney advised to refile using the correct Third Party Summons form provided on the court's website. Document #14 is terminated. PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Laura Leon by Third Party Plaintiffs Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez, Defendants Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez, Counter Claimants Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez. (Raich, Sagar)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 ERROR: Incorrect form used by attorney. Attorney advised to refile using the correct Third Party Summons form provided on the court's website. Document #13 is terminated. PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Alejandro Leon by Third Party Plaintiffs Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez, Defendants Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez, Counter Claimants Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez. (Raich, Sagar)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE and Attorney Action Required re: documents #8 and #11 ERROR: Wrong form used by attorney. CORRECTION: Attorney Sagar Raich advised to download and complete updated "AO 441 (Rev. 7/10) Third Part Summons in a Civil Action" form and file using "Proposed Summons to be Issued" event. The Court will only issue summons submitted on the Courts approved form available on the Court's Website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Documents #8 and #11 terminated as filed in error, pursuant to LR IC 7-1. (no image attached) (DKJ)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 ERROR: Incorrect form used by attorney. Attorney advised to refile using the correct Third Party Summons form. Document #8 is terminated. PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Laura Leon by Third Party Plaintiffs Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez, Defendants Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez, Counter Claimants Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez. (Raich, Sagar)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Raich, Sagar)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/16/2019.), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Laura Leon, Alejandro Leon by Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez., COUNTERCLAIM against Leon Enterprises, Inc. by Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez. filed by Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Answer, Counterclaims, and Third Party Complaint)(Raich, Sagar) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 ERROR: Incorrect form used by attorney. Attorney advised to refile using the correct Third Party Summons form. Document #8 is terminated. PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Defendants Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez. (Raich, Sagar)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sagar R. Raich on behalf of Defendants Melissa Cardenas, Benjamin Gonzalez. (Raich, Sagar)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leon Enterprises, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, #2 Summons Issued. All Defendants. (Hamilton, Ryan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Leon Enterprises, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hamilton, Ryan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (JM)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
September 25, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JM)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5714599) by Leon Enterprises, Inc.. Proof of service due by 12/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons as to Benjamin, #3 Summons Summons as to Melissa)(Hamilton, Ryan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leon Enterprises, Inc. v. Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Cardenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?