Kasel et al v. Rodgers et al
Plaintiff: Lamonte King, Ronald Kasel, James Bunker and Kathryn Peyton
Defendant: Welpman Holdings, LLC, John Frank Rodgers, Einstein Sports Advisory, Ltd, Thomas Becker, Esa, LTD, Jonathan West, ESA, Ltd. and John Thomas
Case Number: 2:2019cv01711
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ronald Kasel. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Callister, Matthew)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #4 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (DKJ)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Defendant Limited Liability Companies' Citizenship re: Diversity Jurisdiction by Ronald Kasel. (Bisson, Mitchell)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/7/2019. On October 4, 2019, Plaintiffs Ronald Kasel, James Bunker, Kathryn Peyton, and Lamonte King (collectively, "Plaintiffs") filed the #1 Complaint, which alleges that this Court has subject matter jurisdiction based on diversity of citizenship between the parties pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. (Compl. paragraphs 1-10). To show Plaintiffs' diversity from the various Limited Liability Company ("LLC") Defendants, Plaintiffs state the principal place of business of the LLCs. (Id. paragraphs 5-6, 8). However, to properly plead diversity jurisdiction for LLCs, the citizenship of all their members must be pled. See NewGen, LLC v. Safe Cig, LLC, 840 F.3d 606, 611 (9th Cir. 2016). Accordingly, to ensure that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs must file a Notice by October 28, 2019, listing the citizenship of all of the members/owners of Einstein Sport Advisory, Ltd., ESA, Ltd., and Welpman Holdings, LLC.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DZ)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Thomas Becker, Einstein Sports Advisory, Ltd, Esa, Ltd, John Frank Rodgers re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
October 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (ADR)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5727776) by Ronald Kasel. Proof of service due by 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Becker, #3 Summons Einstein, #4 Summons ESA, #5 Summons Thomas)(Bisson, Mitchell) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kasel et al v. Rodgers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welpman Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Frank Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Einstein Sports Advisory, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esa, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESA, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamonte King
Represented By: Matthew Q. Callister
Represented By: Mitchell S Bisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Kasel
Represented By: Matthew Q. Callister
Represented By: Mitchell S Bisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bunker
Represented By: Matthew Q. Callister
Represented By: Mitchell S Bisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Peyton
Represented By: Matthew Q. Callister
Represented By: Mitchell S Bisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?