Dickson v. Freed et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Dickson
Defendant: PFG Performance Transportation, LLC, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., PFG Transco, Inc., Andrew Freed, Adolfo Aguilar Chavez and Performance Food Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01718
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (ADR)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #17 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/10/2020. Motions due by 8/10/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/27/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal filed by Andrew Freed.(Amon, Nickolas)
November 26, 2019 Filing 17 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Amanda Dickson. (Troiano, Joseph)
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #12 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Amanda Dickson. (Troiano, Joseph)
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #12 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant PFG Performance Transportation, LLC. Replies due by 11/19/2019. (Wilson, Karie)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Amanda Dickson. (Troiano, Joseph)
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Amanda Dickson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Troiano, Joseph)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Amanda Dickson. Responses due by 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Errata 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Troiano, Joseph)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Deeming Order to Show Cause Satisfied. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #6 Order to Show Cause by Defendant Adolfo Aguilar Chavez. (Wilson, Karie)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Dickson. Andrew Freed served on 10/12/2019, answer due 11/2/2019. (Troiano, Joseph)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of October 3, 2019 Minute Order by Adolfo Aguilar Chavez. (Wilson, Karie)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Adolfo Aguilar Chavez. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/24/2019.(Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/1/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/3/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 3, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (ADR)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Adolfo Chavez that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Insurance, Other Affiliate Adolfo Chavez, Other Affiliate PFG Transco, Inc., Other Affiliate Performance Food Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Performance Transportation, Other Affiliate Corvel Corporation for Adolfo Chavez added. (Wilson, Karie)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Adolfo Chavez. (Wilson, Karie)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-19-801219-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5724949) by Adolfo Chavez. Proof of service due by 11/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickson v. Freed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFG Performance Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Karie N. Wilson
Represented By: Bruce Alverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.
Represented By: Karie N. Wilson
Represented By: Bruce Alverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFG Transco, Inc.
Represented By: Karie N. Wilson
Represented By: Bruce Alverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adolfo Aguilar Chavez
Represented By: Karie N. Wilson
Represented By: Bruce Alverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Food Group, Inc.
Represented By: Karie N. Wilson
Represented By: Bruce Alverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Dickson
Represented By: Jamie S Cogburn
Represented By: Joseph J Troiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?