Peebles v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mira Peebles
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, American Honda Finance Corp, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc and TransUnion LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01746
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting #34 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 4, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #33 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/14/2020. Motions due by 5/14/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/4/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 3, 2019 Filing 34 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Plaintiff Mira Peebles. (Plaksin, Shaina)
December 3, 2019 Filing 33 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Mira Peebles. (Plaksin, Shaina)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting #31 Third Joint Motion to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.'s answer due 12/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 27, 2019 Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Third Request) to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Hernandez, Ramir)
November 22, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC added. (Thompson, Jeremy)
November 22, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy)
November 20, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by TransUnion LLC.(Bergh, Jennifer)
November 18, 2019 Filing 27 ERROR NOTICE to counsel re filing of #25 Certificate of Interested Parties,. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney Chad Butterfield advised that in the future, Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations (including parent corporations) which have a direct pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. (no image attached) (MMM)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #23 Motion to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. American Honda Finance Corp answer due 11/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 18, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by American Honda Finance Corp. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Butterfield, Chad) Corporate Parent American Honda Motor Co., Inc. added for American Honda Finance Corporation. Modified on 11/18/2019 (MMM).
November 18, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by American Honda Finance Corp. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/2/2020.(Butterfield, Chad) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 15, 2019 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant American Honda Finance Corp. (Butterfield, Chad)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #19 Second Motion to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.'s answer due 11/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #20 Second Motion to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services LLC's answer due 11/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 13, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy)
November 13, 2019 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Hernandez, Ramir)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #17 First Joint Motion to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. American Honda Finance Corp's answer due 11/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant American Honda Finance Corp. (Butterfield, Chad)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #10 Motion to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc answer due 11/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time; TransUnion LLC answer due 11/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #11 Motion to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 11/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Docket Correction to ECF No. #11 : Event changed by Court from Stipulation to Joint Motion, pursuant to LR 7-1(c).Attorney Jeremy Thompson is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Docket Correction to ECF No. #8 : Event changed by Court from Stipulation to Joint Motion, pursuant to LR 7-1(c). Attorney Jennifer Bergh is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) Modified event on 10/31/2019 (MMM).
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Hernandez, Ramir)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by TransUnion LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion for TransUnion LLC added. (Bergh, Jennifer)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant TransUnion LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer) Modified event on 10/31/2019 (MMM).
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Rebecca Bergh on behalf of Defendant TransUnion LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc added. (Hernandez, Ramir)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramir Mitchell Hernandez on behalf of Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Hernandez, Ramir)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
October 8, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mira Peebles. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5730528) by Mira Peebles. Proof of service due by 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Equifax, #3 Summons Honda, #4 Summons SPS, #5 Summons TransUnion)(Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peebles v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Jeremy J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Finance Corp
Represented By: Chad C. Butterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc
Represented By: R. Samuel Ehlers
Represented By: Ramir Mitchell Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Rebecca Bergh
Represented By: Trevor Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mira Peebles
Represented By: Shaina R Plaksin
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?