Anniversary Mining Claims L.L.C. v. The Five Star Trust dated 05/27/2015 et al
Plaintiff: Anniversary Mining Claims L.L.C.
Defendant: Chicago Title Co., DIVISION OF RIGHT OF WAY AND LANDS SURVEYS, ERIC CHRISTENSEN, The Five Star Trust dated, KEWITT INFASTRUCTURE WEST CO, P8 Equipment LLC and California Department of Transportation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01781
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service re #7 Amended Complaint. (JQC)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/22/2019. Re #4 Motion to Dismiss. In light of the filing of the amended complaint #7 , which supersedes the original complaint and moots the motion to dismiss it #4 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to dismiss the original complaint #4 is DENIED without prejudice, and the 12/16/19 hearing on that motion 6 is VACATED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to California Department of Transportation re #7 Amended Complaint. (MR)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Anniversary Mining Claims L.L.C.. (Bisson, Mitchell)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chicago Title Co., Eric Christensen, Kewitt Infastructure West Co, P8 Equipment LLC, The Five Star Trust dated 05/27/2015, California Department of Transportation by Anniversary Mining Claims L.L.C.. Adds and removes parties. Proof of service due by 2/19/2020.(Bisson, Mitchell)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Setting Hearing on #4 MOTION to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2019 at 03:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (no image attached) (DC)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Eric Christensen, P8 Equipment LLC, The Five Star Trust dated 05/27/2015. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Knecht, Adam)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Eric Christensen, P8 Equipment LLC, The Five Star Trust dated 05/27/2015. Responses due by 11/29/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/30/2019. (Knecht, Adam) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Chicago Title Co., Eric Christensen, Division of Right of Way and Lands Surveys, Kewitt Infastructure West Co, P8 Equipment LLC, The Five Star Trust dated 05/27/2015 re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
October 15, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JQC)
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Anniversary Mining Claims L.L.C.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bisson, Mitchell)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5736754) by Anniversary Mining Claims L.L.C.. Proof of service due by 1/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Five Star, #3 Summons P8 Equipment, #4 Summons Christensen, #5 Summons Kewitt, #6 Summons Chicago Title, #7 Summons Division)(Bisson, Mitchell) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anniversary Mining Claims L.L.C. v. The Five Star Trust dated 05/27/2015 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIVISION OF RIGHT OF WAY AND LANDS SURVEYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC CHRISTENSEN
Represented By: Adam R Knecht
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Five Star Trust dated
Represented By: Adam R Knecht
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEWITT INFASTRUCTURE WEST CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P8 Equipment LLC
Represented By: Adam R Knecht
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anniversary Mining Claims L.L.C.
Represented By: Mitchell S Bisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?