Czudar v. Pro-Vigil, Inc.
Plaintiff: Julius Czudar
Defendant: Pro-Vigil, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01784
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #1 Complaint. Pro-Vigil, Inc.'s answer due 12/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Pro-Vigil, Inc.. (McClane, Lisa)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #1 Complaint. Pro-Vigil, Inc.'s answer due 12/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #1 Complaint, filed by Defendant Pro-Vigil, Inc.. (McClane, Lisa)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julius Czudar re #2 Summons Issued. Pro-Vigil, Inc. served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Trenchak, Philip)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Julius Czudar. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Trenchak, Philip)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (SLD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Pro-Vigil, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
October 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (SLD)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5736943) by Julius Czudar. Proof of service due by 1/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Trenchak, Philip) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Czudar v. Pro-Vigil, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Czudar
Represented By: Victoria Mullins
Represented By: Philip J Trenchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro-Vigil, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa A McClane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?