Budge v. Saul
Plaintiff: Sydney Budge
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv01804
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Sydney Budge. Proof of service due by 2/16/2020.(SLD)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Re: #4 Notice of Payment. The Clerks Office is instructed to file Plaintiffs #1 -1 complaint. Plaintiff must properly serve the complaint within 90 days of the issuance of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE re: Filing Fee Payment re #3 Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Sydney Budge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Safa, Cyrus)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiff's #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice to file a new application. Plaintiff shall either: (1) file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis; or (2) pay the full $400 fee for filing a civil action by 11/15/2019. The Clerk of the Court shall retain the #1 -1 complaint, but shall not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 15, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RFJ)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sydney Budge. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Safa, Cyrus)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sydney Budge. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Safa, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Budge v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sydney Budge
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Represented By: Gerald Morris Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?