IP Power Holdings Limited v. Westfield Outdoor, Inc.
Plaintiff: IP Power Holdings Limited
Defendant: Westfield Outdoor, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01878
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
2 Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Ryan W. Koppelman is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting ECF No. #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ryan W. Koppelman for IP Power Holdings Limited, and approving designation of local counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/4/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ryan W. Koppelman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael N. Feder (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5762111) by Plaintiff IP Power Holdings Limited. (Feder, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is reassigned to the patent pilot program. Chief Judge Miranda M. Du for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01878-MMD-NJK. (no image attached) (EDS)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/28/2019. The Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey is no longer assigned to this case. Pursuant to General Order No. 2011-03, IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment to one of the designated patent pilot program judges for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Westfield Outdoor, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ADR)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Ryan W Koppelman to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/7/2019. (no image attached) (ADR)
October 23, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (ADR)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by IP Power Holdings Limited. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Feder, Michael)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Westfield Outdoor, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5749269) by IP Power Holdings Limited. Proof of service due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 671 Patent, #2 Exhibit B March 22, 2019 Communication from IP Power to Westfield, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Feder, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IP Power Holdings Limited v. Westfield Outdoor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IP Power Holdings Limited
Represented By: Ryan W Koppelman
Represented By: Michael N Feder
Represented By: Ryan W. Koppelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westfield Outdoor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?