Soylent Nutrition, Inc. v. Jue et al
Plaintiff: Soylent Nutrition, Inc.
Defendant: Wen Jun and Jeffrey Li Jue
Case Number: 2:2019cv01887
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission for Lisa M. Martens to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael J. McCue. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/13/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lisa M. Martens and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael J. McCue (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5809102) by Plaintiff Soylent Nutrition, Inc.. (McCue, Michael)
December 10, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Soylent Nutrition, Inc. re #7 Summons Returned Unexecuted, #8 Summons Returned Unexecuted, #1 Complaint,, #4 Summons Issued. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McCue, Michael)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 EX PARTE MOTION to Serve Defendants Via Email by Plaintiff Soylent Nutrition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Lisa M. Martens) (McCue, Michael)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 ERROR: Filed using incorrect filer account. Counsel to refile EX PARTE MOTION to Serve Defendants Via Email by Plaintiff Soylent Nutrition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Lisa M. Martens) (Zhong, Meng)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Soylent Nutrition, Inc. as to Wen Jun re #1 Complaint,, #4 Summons Issued. (Zhong, Meng)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Soylent Nutrition, Inc. as to Jeffrey Li Jue re #1 Complaint,, #4 Summons Issued. (Zhong, Meng)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Lisa Martens to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/12/2019. (no image attached) (MMM)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (JM)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 25, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JM)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Soylent Nutrition, Inc. Jeffrey Li Jue, Wen Jun (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5751289) by Soylent Nutrition, Inc.. Proof of service due by 1/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Jeffrey Li Jue, #9 Summons Wen Jun)(McCue, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified Document No. on 10/25/2019 (JM). Modified on 10/28/2019 (MMM).
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Soylent Nutrition, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (McCue, Michael) Modified Document No. on 10/25/2019 (JM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soylent Nutrition, Inc. v. Jue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wen Jun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Li Jue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soylent Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Meng Zhong
Represented By: Lisa Martens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?