Orcutt v. Saul
Plaintiff: Catherine A. Orcutt
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv01920
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Jaime Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #8 Summons Issued as to USA. AUSA served on 11/21/2019, answer due 1/20/2020. (MR)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7018 2290 0001 8797 0618 for #8 Summons Issued as to USA. (MR)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew R. McGarry for Catherine A. Orcutt and approving Designation of Local Counsel Hal Taylor. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/18/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #10 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff Catherine A. Orcutt. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cert. of Good Standing) (Taylor, Hal)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/15/2019. Re: #10 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel #10 is DEFERRED. IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that Petitioner Matthew R. McGarry is directed to appropriately answer question 7 on page 3 in petitioner's Verified Petition.Petitioner shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file corrected Verified Petitions using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petitions, and Petitioners will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLM)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 VIEW #12 corrected image re MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Matthew R. McGarry and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5776925) by Plaintiff Catherine A. Orcutt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing) (Taylor, Hal)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 Certified Mail Receipts 7018 2290 0001 8797 0618 and 7018 2290 0001 8797 0625 for #8 Summons Issued as to USA re #7 Complaint. (MR)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #7 Complaint. (cc: AUSA summons & #7 Complaint to USM - MR)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul by Catherine A. Orcutt. Proof of service due by 2/10/2020. (MR)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #5 Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED with the caveat that the fees shall be paid if recovery is made. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file #1 -2 the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - MR)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Final MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Catherine A. Orcutt. (Taylor, Hal)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Catherine A. Orcutt. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court must send Plaintiff a copy of the Long Form application (AO 239) (the "Long Form"). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 AO239 Form) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #1 -7 Certificate of Interested Parties. The Certificate of Interested Parties should be filed as a separate entry and not as an attachment. Counsel is advised to file the Certificate of Interested parties as a separate entry. (no image attached) (DKJ)
October 30, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DKJ)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Catherine A. Orcutt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Summons OGC, #5 Summons USAG, #6 Summons USAO, #7 Cert. Interested Parties) (Taylor, Hal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orcutt v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine A. Orcutt
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Represented By: Matthew R. McGarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?