United States v. Dalacas et al
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Republic Services Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., City of Las Vegas, Clark County, Copper Creek Construction, Inc, R & K Development, Inc., Demetrios A. Dalacas, Elene Mylordos, Republic Silver State Disposal Inc. and Las Vegas Valley Water District
Case Number: 2:2019cv01937
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to R & K Development, Inc. and Copper Creek Construction, Inc, re #10 , #11 Motions for Entry of Clerks Default. (MR)
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default against Defendant R & K Development Inc. by Plaintiff United States. (Kukso, Boris)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default against Defendant Copper Creek Construction Inc. by Plaintiff United States. (Kukso, Boris)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Disclaimer of Interest by City of Las Vegas re #3 Amended Complaint. (Dorocak, Jeffry)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to approve Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/22/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States re #3 Amended Complaint. City of Las Vegas served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019; Copper Creek Construction, Inc served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019; Demetrios A. Dalacas served on 11/10/2019, answer due 12/1/2019; Las Vegas Valley Water District served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019; R & K Development, Inc. served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Kukso, Boris)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION To Approve Stipulation As To Priority by Plaintiff United States. Responses due by 11/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kukso, Boris)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Las Vegas Valley Water District. (JM)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Republic Silver State Disposal Inc. (JM) Modified party name on 11/7/2019 (EDS).
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 2/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Republic Silver State Disposal, #2 Summons Las Vegas Valley Water District)(Kukso, Boris)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Las Vegas, Copper Creek Construction, Inc, Demetrios A. Dalacas, Elene Mylordos, R & K Development, Inc., Republic Services Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (JM)
November 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States. Proof of service due by 2/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Copper Creek, #3 Summons Dalacas, #4 Summons Las Vegas, #5 Summons Mylordos, #6 Summons R & K, #7 Summons Republic Services, #8 Summons Wells Fargo NA)(Kukso, Boris) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Dalacas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Vegas
Represented By: Jeffry Dorocak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copper Creek Construction, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & K Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demetrios A. Dalacas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elene Mylordos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Silver State Disposal Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Valley Water District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Nicholas Trutanich
Represented By: Boris Kukso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?