Motley v. Dzurenda
Petitioner: Courtney Motley
Respondent: James Dzurenda
Case Number: 2:2019cv01963
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 11/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 the application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that the clerk of the court file #1 -1 the petition for a writ of habeas corpus. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that the petition for a writ of habeas corpus is DENIED. The clerk of the court shall enter judgment accordingly and close this action. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that a certificate of appealability will not issue. See Order for further specifications. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Nevada Attorney General - ADR)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Dzurenda, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:19-cv-01963-GMN-NJK. (ADR)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Petitioner Courtney Motley. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(ADR)
November 7, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motley v. Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Courtney Motley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Dzurenda
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?