Davies v. GEICO
Plaintiff: Andrew Davies
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01987
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Andrew Davies. (Troiano, Joseph)
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Andrew Davies. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Troiano, Joseph)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order or a Status Report due by 1/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss, #7 Motion to Stay Case by Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company. (Hansard, Wade)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss, #7 Motion to Stay Case by Plaintiff Andrew Davies. Replies due by 12/12/2019. (Troiano, Joseph)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company. (Hansard, Wade)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company. (Hansard, Wade)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company. Responses due by 12/5/2019. (Hansard, Wade)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/14/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/29/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant GEICO General Insurance Company erroneously sued and served herein as Government Employees Insurance Company d/b/a GEICO. (Hansard, Wade)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GEICO General Insurance Company erroneously sued and served herein as Government Employees Insurance Company d/b/a GEICO that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Other Affiliate Government Employees Insurance Company for GEICO General Insurance Company erroneously sued and served herein as Government Employees Insurance Company d/b/a GEICO added. (Hansard, Wade)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-19-803353-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5776297) by GEICO General Insurance Company erroneously sued and served herein as Government Employees Insurance Company d/b/a GEICO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansard, Wade) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davies v. GEICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Renee Maxfield
Represented By: Jonathan W Carlson
Represented By: Wade M. Hansard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Davies
Represented By: Jamie S Cogburn
Represented By: Joseph J Troiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?