United States ex rel. Foothills Services, Inc. v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company et al
Defendant: Sayers Construction, LLC, United States ex rel. Foothills Services, Inc., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company and United States ex rel. Foothills Energy Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02016
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Kent J Dawson
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sayers Construction, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Alderfer, Amy)
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Sayers Construction, LLC.(Alderfer, Amy)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 ERROR NOTICE to counsel re filing of #8 Certificate of Interested Parties. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney Willi H. Siepmann advised that in the future, Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations (including parent corporations) which have a direct pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. (no image attached) (MMM)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant United States ex rel. Foothills Energy Services, Inc.. (Silvestri, Phillip)
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Siepmann, Willi) Corporate Parents Philadelphia Insurance Companies, Tokio Marine Groups, Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. added. Modified on 1/10/2020 (MMM).
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/22/2020.(Siepmann, Willi) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Stipulation; Sayers Construction, LLC answer due 1/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Casey Griffith; Michael Barbee; Maeghan Whitehead to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 2/18/2020. (no image attached) (MMM)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Sayers Construction, LLC. (Alderfer, Amy)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by United States ex rel. Foothills Energy Services, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Silvestri, Phillip)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Sayers Construction, LLC re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
November 22, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (SLD)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Sayers Construction, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5787379) by United States ex rel. Foothills Services, Inc.. Proof of service due by 2/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, #5 Summons Sayers Construction, LLC)(Silvestri, Phillip) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States ex rel. Foothills Services, Inc. v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sayers Construction, LLC
Represented By: Amy B. Alderfer
Represented By: Casey Griffith
Represented By: Maeghan Whitehead
Represented By: Michael Barbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States ex rel. Foothills Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Willi H. Siepmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States ex rel. Foothills Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip A. Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?