Gray v. Saul
Plaintiff: Christine E. Gray
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv02052
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-02052-VCF. (no image attached) (JM)
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (JM)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Jaime Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT as to SSA re #6 Certified Mail Receipt. (JM)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #4 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued as to USA. Andrew Saul served on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/17/2020. (JM)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS (0656 Atty Genl;0663 SSA) re #4 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued as to USA. (JM)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JM - cc: USM)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Christine E. Gray. Proof of service due by 3/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JM)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk to file Complaint and serve Summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/17/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 27, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DKJ)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Christine E. Gray. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Christine E. Gray. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kalagian, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine E. Gray
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Gerald Morris Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?