Musin v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Musin
Defendant: Mission Support and Test Services LLC, Mark Martinez and Honeywell International, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02058
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #1 Complaint. Honeywell International, Inc.; Mark Martinez; Mission Support and Test Services LLC answer's due 2/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Answers or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Honeywell International, Inc., Mark Martinez, Mission Support and Test Services LLC. (Christensen, Deverie)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
November 27, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Stephen Musin. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kemp, James)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5794075) by Stephen Musin. Proof of service due by 2/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons Honeywell International Inc, #3 Summons Summons Mission Support and Test Services LLC, #4 Summons Summons Mark Martinez)(Kemp, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Musin v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Support and Test Services LLC
Represented By: Deverie J. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Martinez
Represented By: Deverie J. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Deverie J. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Musin
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?