Schenk v. Saul
Plaintiff: Barbara Schenk
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv02062
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-02062-DJA. (no image attached) (JM)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Jaime Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (JM)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Schenk. Andrew Saul served on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. (Kalagian, Marc)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JM)
December 2, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JM)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Barbara Schenk. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5795799) by Barbara Schenk. Proof of service due by 3/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kalagian, Marc) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schenk v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Schenk
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Leonard Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?