Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc. v. Orolia USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Orolia USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02100
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Lester Julian Savit is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lester Julian Savit for Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Chad R. Fears. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/6/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lester Julian Savit and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad R. Fears (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5833454) by Plaintiff Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc.. (Fears, Chad)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Damon Guizot is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Damon Guizot for Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc., and approving Designation of Local Counsel Chad R. Fears. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/23/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Damon Guizot and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad R. Fears (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5819666) by Plaintiff Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc.. (Fears, Chad)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Judge Robert C. Jones for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-02100-RCJ-DJA. (no image attached) (EDS)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/9/2019. The Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon is no longer assigned to this case. Pursuant to General Order No. 2011-03, IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment to one of the designated patent pilot program judges for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Orolia USA, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (MR)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Damon Guizot, Jonathan Jaech, and Lester Julian Savit to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/23/2020. (no image attached) (MR)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
December 6, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (MR)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gutke, David)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Orolia USA, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5803329) by Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc.. Proof of service due by 3/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '211 Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Gutke, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc. v. Orolia USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orolia USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Labs Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: David W Gutke
Represented By: Damon Guizot
Represented By: Lester Julian Savit
Represented By: Jonathan Jaech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?